-
Distinguished Professor, Chemistry
-
Henry Eyring Presidential Endowed Chair of Chemistry , Chemistry
Professional Service
- AVS.
Executive Committee AVS Surface Science Division.
01/01/2021 - 12/31/2023
- American Physical Society.
March Meeting Task Force.
01/01/2020 - 12/2020
- APS Plyler Prize.
Role: Committee Member.
Selection Committee for 2020 APS Plyler Prize.
01/01/2019 - 12/30/2019
- APS Division of Chemical Physics.
Chair.
03/2018 - 02/2019
- DOE SGCSR Review Panel.
DOE Separations and Analysis, PNNL review panel.
05/2017 - 05/2017
- APS Division of Chemical Physics.
Chair Elect.
03/2017 - 02/2018
- 2017 Jankunas Award (APS DCP).
Selection Committee.
01/2017 - 12/2017
- Cluster-Surface Interactions.
Co-Organizer (with Stefan Vajda).
06/2016 - 07/2016
- Div. Chem. Phys., American Physical Society.
Leadership Rotation.
03/2016 - 03/2020
- APS Division of Chemical Physics.
Vice Chair.
03/2016 - 02/2017
- Surface Science.
Editorial Advisory Board.
01/2015 - present
- Acc. Chem. Res.
Editorial Advisory Board.
01/2015 - present
- Gordon Conferences.
Role: Discussion Leader.
Gordon Conference on Dynamics at Surfaces .
08/2013 - 08/2013
- Utah Nanofab and Microscopy Core Facilities.
Assoc. Director.
07/01/2013 - 06/30/2021
- American Physical Society.
Role: Committee Member - Chair in 2015.
Fellowship Committee (DCP), 2013 – 2015 .
01/01/2013 - 12/2015
- J. Phys. Chem.
Editorial Board.
01/2012 - 12/2014
- Catalyst/Fuel Interactions Basic Research Initiative.
Director.
01/01/2012 - 01/2015
- Dynamics of Molecular Collisions.
Role: Discussion Leader,.
Dynamics of Molecular Collisions, July 10-15 2011.
07/10/2011 - 07/15/2011
- PNLB.
Role: Committee Member.
Program review committee, Analysis program, Pacific Northwest National Lab, May 8 - 10, 2011.
05/08/2011 - 05/10/2011
- GRC.
Role: Chair.
Chair, Gordon Conf on Gaseous Ions, Hotel Galvez, Galveston, TX, Feb. 27 – Mar. 4, 2011.
02/27/2011 - 03/04/2011
- NASA Engineering and Safety Center.
NASA Engineering and Safety Center review of monopropellant catalysts, Redmond, WA Feb. 1 – 2,
2011.
02/01/2011 - 02/02/2011
Internal Service
- Chemistry Department Faculty Search Chair.
Chair,
01/01/2020 - 12/2021.
College service.
- Chemistry Department, RPT subcommittee chair.
Chair,
01/01/2020 - 01/01/2021.
Department service.
- Chemistry Dept. Technical Support Committee (electronics shop) .
01/01/2018 - present.
Department service.
- College of Science Dean search committee.
Member,
01/01/2018 - 05/31/2019.
College service.
- College of Science Dean search committee.
01/01/2018 - 01/01/2019.
College service.
- Graduate Council internal review panel for Material Science and Engineering.
01/01/2018 - 12/2018.
College service.
- Chemistry Department, RPT subcommittee chair .
07/01/2017 - 06/30/2018.
Department service.
- Chemistry Department seminar committee.
01/01/2017 - 01/01/2018.
Department service.
- Chemistry Dept. Technical Support Committee Chair and Stockroom.
07/01/2014 - present.
Department service.
- Chemistry Dept. Safety and Sustainability Committee.
07/01/2013 - present.
Department service.
- Microscopy and Surf. Analysis, Utah Nanofab and Microscopy Core .
Associate Director,
01/01/2013 - present.
Department service.
- Faculty Search.
Chair,
07/2012 - 06/2014.
Department service.
- College of Science Retention Promotion Tenure committee.
Chair,
07/2012 - 06/2013.
College service.
- Faculty Awards Committee.
Member,
07/01/2011 - present.
Department service.
- Faculty search Committee.
Chair,
07/01/2011 - 12/2012.
Department service.
- Physical Chemistry Division Chair/Advisory Committee.
Member,
07/01/2011 - 06/30/2012.
Department service.
- Nanofab Executive Committee - College of Engineering.
07/01/2005 - present.
College service.
Honors & Awards
- Flinders Univ. Visiting International Research Fellowship.
08/01/2022
- ACS Utah Outstanding Chemist Award.
04/01/2022
- ACS Physical Division Award in Experimental Physical Chemistry.
American Chemical Society,
01/2016
- Robert W. Parry Teaching Award.
Brady Foundation ,
01/2015
- Distinguished Professor.
University of Utah,
09/2011
- Fellow.
American Association for the Advancement of Science,
03/2011